Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de França Castro e Moura, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1804BornSão Cosme de Gondomar
1829¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
1833¹28.8ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
28 Aug 184036.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Peking [Beijing], China
1 Sep 184036.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
8 Mar 184642.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Peking [Beijing], China
8 Mar 184642.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
22 Apr 186258.1SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
21 May 186258.2ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
6 Jul 186258.3Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
16 Oct 186864.6DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de França Castro e Moura:
Bishop João de França Castro e Moura C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 465
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 153, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013