Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Osvaldo Casali

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Camerino, Italy

Titular Bishop of Miletus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1824Born
3 Apr 184722.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189267.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Camerino, Italy
11 Jul 189267.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletus
7 Aug 189267.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletus
1907¹82.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Osvaldo Casali (VIAF: 90201480)
Bishop Osvaldo Casali (born , died 1907) Auxiliary Bishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino, Archdiocese of Camerino
Ordained BishopCamerino, Archdiocese of Camerino

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017