Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Cortés y Cullell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona

Titular Bishop of Eudoxias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1842BornBarcelona
25 Jun 190360.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
25 Jun 190360.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudoxias
25 Oct 190361.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eudoxias
20 Mar 191067.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Cortés y Cullell:
Bishop Ricardo Cortés y Cullell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013