Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giambattista Candiotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornSan Angelo in Vado
11 Jun 165045.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 167570.6AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
15 Sep 167570.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
Sep 1684³79.6DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Candiotti:
Archbishop Giambattista Candiotti , Archbishop of Urbino

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015