Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaume Camprodon Rovira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Girona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1926Born
22 May 194922.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 197346.7AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
21 Oct 197346.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
30 Oct 200174.8RetiredBishop of Girona, Spain
26 Dec 201690.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Girona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaume Camprodon Rovira (VIAF: 1433822)
Bishop Jaume Camprodon Rovira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Girona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorelló

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: CB, 27 Dec 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast