Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Patrick Byrne

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1843Born
1865²21.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst, Australia
5 May 188541.8AppointedBishop of Bathurst, Australia
9 Aug 188542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst, Australia
12 Jan 190157.5DiedBishop of Bathurst, Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Byrne
Bishop Joseph Patrick Byrne (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSts. Michael and John, Cathedral, Bathurst, Diocese of Bathurst

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017