Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Burgat

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹Born
17 Apr 165753.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Emly, Ireland
24 Nov 166561.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Elphin, Ireland
8 Mar 166965.1AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
Aug 1669³65.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
27 Apr 167571.3DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for William Burgat
Archbishop William Burgat (born 1604, died ) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisheen, Co. Tipperary, Diocese of Emly

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast