Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino de Gemmis

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1746BornTerlizzi
22 Dec 177024.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 179851.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
18 Mar 179851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
22 May 181871.6SelectedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
26 Jun 181871.7ConfirmedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
12 Dec 182276.1DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino de Gemmis
Bishop Gioacchino de Gemmis (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1822
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 270
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016