Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Buisseret

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1549³BornMons
3 Dec 160152.2AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
10 Feb 160252.4Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
9 Feb 161565.4AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
24 Mar 161565.5InstalledArchbishop of Cambrai, France
2 May 161565.6DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Buisseret:
Archbishop François Buisseret (died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251, and Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 11 Feb 2015