Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Le Mire (Miraeus)

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1560Born
15 Mar 160444.1AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
30 May 160444.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
12 Jan 161151.0DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Le Mire (Miraeus)
Bishop Jean Le Mire (Miraeus) (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast