Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Sanseverino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alife, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1711³Born
4 Jun 173524.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175745.6AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
6 Jan 175745.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
26 Jan 176250.6ResignedBishop of Alife, Italy
29 Jan 177058.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
10 Sep 179079.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Sanseverino (VIAF: 162190938)
Archbishop Filippo Sanseverino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera dei Pagani, Diocese of Nocera de’ Pagani
Ordained BishopSant'Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)SS Sacramento nell'Arcivescovado, Chapel, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 3
  • d/loc: AT, 25 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 Jun 2018

Quantcast