Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonín Bernard Gürtler

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1726³Born
23 May 175024.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 177347.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
29 Jun 177347.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
28 May 179165.0DiedTitular Bishop of Tium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonín Bernard Gürtler (VIAF: 306356778)
Bishop Antonín Bernard Gürtler (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFalknov, Diocese of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 20
  • loc: AT, 25 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 Jun 2018

Quantcast