Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guerrino Riccardo Brusati

Bishop Emeritus of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1945 Born
23 Jun 197328.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 200257.5AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
8 Feb 200357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
27 May 201570.1AppointedBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Jun 201974.1ResignedBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Guerrino Riccardo Brusati
Bishop Guerrino Riccardo Brusati (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Janaúba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellinzago Novarese, Diocese of Novara, Italy
Ordained BishopPlaza, Cathedral, Caetité, Diocese of Caetité, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Janaúba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,325
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 May 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast