Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Levreri (Levrieri)

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1753Born
23 Dec 177623.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 182066.6SelectedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
2 Oct 182066.8ConfirmedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
17 Dec 182067.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
5 May 182470.4DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Levreri (Levrieri)
Bishop Felice Levreri (Levrieri) (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast