Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Fructueux Bourgain, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ningyüanfu

Titular Bishop of Archelaïs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1872BornLe Portel, France
20 Sep 189119.4ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Jun 189624.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
31 Mar 191846.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kienchang, China
31 Mar 191846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
10 Nov 191846.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
30 Sep 192553.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Ningyüanfu, China

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Fructueux Bourgain:
Bishop Joseph-Fructueux Bourgain M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ningyüanfu

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013