Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Giacomo Borghi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1803BornLivorno
182723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Aug 183835.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India
14 Aug 183835.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
2 Jun 183936.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
5 Nov 184946.8AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
31 Jul 185148.5DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Giacomo Borghi:
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Giacomo Borghi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 111
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 21 Oct 2013