Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Botti (Blotto), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1645BornIanuen
24 Jan 168943.6AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
Nov 168944.4DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Botti (Blotto):
Bishop Alberto Botti (Blotto) O. Carm. (born ) Bishop of Albenga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013