Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Blomjous, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mwanza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1908BornOisterwijk, Netherlands
29 Jun 193426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Apr 194638.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Musoma-Maswa, Tanzania
11 Apr 194638.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bubastis
6 Oct 194638.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bubastis
24 Jun 195042.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mwanza, Tanzania
24 Jun 195042.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Maswa, Tanzania
25 Mar 195345.1AppointedBishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
25 Mar 195345.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Maswa, Tanzania
15 Oct 196557.6ResignedBishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
15 Oct 196557.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
13 May 197769.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
3 Nov 199284.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mwanza, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joseph Blomjous:
Bishop Joseph Blomjous M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mwanza

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015