Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Bernardini

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647¹BornLecce
25 Aug 166821.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 167730.3AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
1 May 167730.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
18 Jun 169649.4AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
Jan 1723³76.0DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Bernardini:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Bernardini (born 1647, died Jan 1723) Bishop of Mileto

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148, and Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015