Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Guerrero de Torres, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1641³Born
28 Feb 166524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
13 Apr 169352.1AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
18 Apr 169352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
26 Mar 172079.0DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Guerrero de Torres
Bishop José Guerrero de Torres O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntequera, Spain

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 234, Number 1,455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast