Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Beriscia

Deceased

Bishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1821Born
14 Jun 186442.4AppointedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
28 Aug 186442.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
21 Aug 186947.6DiedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania

MicroData Summary for Paolo Beriscia
Bishop Paolo Beriscia (born , died ) Bishop of Pult (Pulati)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePriserendi
Ordained BishopScutari, Diocese of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 472
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1864, Number 26
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,757

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast