Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyprian Odyniec, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1749Born
26 Sep 176415.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
4 Sep 179848.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
17 Nov 179849.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
17 Nov 179849.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
28 Jul 181161.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Cyprian Odyniec
Bishop Cyprian Odyniec S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrodno

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,192
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,511
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 216
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,055
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast