Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Luigi Rusconi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cesena

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1747BornBologna
21 Dec 177124.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 180153.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cesena, Italy
23 Feb 180153.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
25 Oct 180154.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
29 Mar 180557.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Luigi Rusconi:
Bishop Pietro Luigi Rusconi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cesena

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013