Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Naselli, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1782³BornPalermo
19 Dec 180725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
3 Jul 183755.0SelectedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
15 Feb 183855.6ConfirmedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
13 Jul 184058.0ResignedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
13 Jul 184058.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
16 Dec 186280.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Naselli:
Archbishop Pietro Naselli C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina

  • a priest for 55.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 283, and Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013