Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Avio

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1635BornCamerinen
7 Jun 165924.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 168853.0AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
23 May 168853.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
2 Oct 170267.4AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
15 Sep 170368.4DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Avio:
Bishop Alessandro Avio (died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 315, and Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013