Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Atallah, O.A.M.

Bishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1937 BornHemayri (Adonis)
8 Dec 196326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
24 Sep 200568.7SelectedBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Dec 200569.0ConfirmedBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Feb 200669.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Simon Atallah:
Bishop Simon Atallah O.A.M. (born ) Bishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,059

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014