Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Arnaldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1806Born
12 Oct 182822.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185246.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Terni, Italy
18 Mar 185246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
2 May 185246.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
7 Mar 185347.1AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
28 Feb 186761.1DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Arnaldi (VIAF: 88638061)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Arnaldi (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellaro
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 527
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast