Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentino Armellini

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1771Born
20 Sep 179422.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 183563.4AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
26 Apr 183563.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
17 Dec 184170.1DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Valentino Armellini
Bishop Valentino Armellini (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1840
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast