Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Ariani

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1651Born
14 Jan 169745.9AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
20 Jan 169745.9Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
Aug 1706³55.4DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Ariani
Bishop Andrea Ariani (born , died Aug 1706) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast