Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Aretini-Sillani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1786BornSigillo
12 Jun 181326.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 183548.6AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
26 Apr 183548.6Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
4 Dec 185367.2ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
12 Aug 187588.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Aretini-Sillani
Bishop Guglielmo Aretini-Sillani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1835, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016