Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Appignanesi

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1781BornTorre
22 Mar 180624.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 183048.6AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
21 Mar 183048.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
27 Sep 1837³56.1DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Appignanesi
Bishop Filippo Appignanesi (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1836
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1830, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016