Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal de Simeoni

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1737BornBenevento
16 Dec 178245.0AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
9 Mar 178345.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
8 Mar 181678.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Jul 181678.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jul 181678.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
31 Dec 181780.0DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo de Simeoni:
Cardinal Camillo de Simeoni (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013