Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Marshall Andradi, O.M.I.

Bishop of Anuradhapura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1949 BornMaggona
8 Sep 197425.0ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
10 May 198030.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Nov 200354.2AppointedBishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka
10 Jan 200454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Norbert Marshall Andradi:
Bishop Norbert Marshall Andradi O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Anuradhapura

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Anuradhapura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013