Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Perfecto Amézquita y Gutiérrez, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1835BornCiudad Fernández
29 Apr 186025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Jun 188651.1AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
5 Sep 188651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
3 Dec 189661.6AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
4 Mar 189761.8InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
27 Oct 190065.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Perfecto Amézquita y Gutiérrez:
Bishop Perfecto Amézquita y Gutiérrez C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 533, and Page 557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015