Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Napoli

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1609AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
6 Dec 1609Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
23 Aug 1648³DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Napoli:
Bishop Vincenzo Napoli (died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 48, Number 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013