Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Guzzetta

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus

Titular See: (Ordinary for Greek-Melkite in Sicile)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1731BornPiana dei Greci, Italy
Dec 1754³23.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 180270.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
1 May 180270.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
181381.6DiedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Guzzetta:
Bishop Giuseppe Guzzetta (born ) Titular Bishop of Lampsacus

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013