Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ad Abi Karam

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1937 Born
25 Mar 196224.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 200164.5AppointedBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
12 Jan 200264.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
8 Feb 200264.8InstalledBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
17 Apr 201376.0RetiredBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia

MicroData Summary for Ad Abi Karam
Bishop Ad Abi Karam (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKornet Chehwan, Lebanon

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,115
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast