Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]

Dioecesis Chilinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 163,000 (62,958 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Kiang-Yen-Chien, Jilin, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Manchuria {Manciuria Settentrionale}
10 May 1898SplitVicariate Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Manchuria {Manciuria Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Kirin [Jilin]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Manchuria {Manciuria Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kirin [Jilin]
9 July 1928Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]
Vicariate Apostolic of Kirin [Jilin]
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tsitsihar [Qiqihar] (erected)
Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kirin [Jilin] Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]
194935,0009,000,000.4%33331,060223ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast