Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Zawitkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łowicz, Poland

Titular Bishop of Ausana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1938Born
20 May 196223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
26 May 199051.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
26 May 199051.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausana
9 Jun 199051.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausana
25 Mar 199253.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łowicz, Poland
9 Dec 201375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Łowicz, Poland
29 Oct 202081.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łowicz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Zawitkowski (VIAF: 101759937)
Bishop Józef Zawitkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łowicz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWal
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Łowicz
Death PlaceHospital, Warsaw, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,070
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2013
  • d: CB, 29 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast