Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Zareba

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1910Born
17 Jun 193423.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 196352.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Jun 196352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitylius
8 Sep 196352.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitylius
20 Oct 196958.8AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
22 Nov 198675.9DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Zareba
Bishop Jan Zareba (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSadykierz

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast