Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paol’Antonio Agostini Zamperoli

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1733Born
18 Sep 175622.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 177946.0AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
2 Jan 178046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
1813¹79.1DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paol’Antonio Agostini Zamperoli (VIAF: 88685260)
Bishop Paol’Antonio Agostini Zamperoli (born , died 1813) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro
Ordained BishopCagli, Diocese of Cagli

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806, Page 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 84
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast