Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Chryzostom Załuski

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1648Born
30 Nov 167325.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 168335.7AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
2 Jan 168435.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
15 Oct 169244.7AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
6 Jun 169850.3SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
18 May 169951.3ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 May 171163.2DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Chryzostom Załuski (VIAF: 72194042)
Bishop Andrzej Chryzostom Załuski (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRawa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232, and Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 405
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 40
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast