Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Yáñez de Montenegro

Deceased

Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1791Born
17 Jan 181927.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Jan 181927.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 184856.3AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
14 Jan 184957.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
24 Nov 185462.9DiedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José María Yáñez de Montenegro (VIAF: 622145857117122922630)
Bishop José María Yáñez de Montenegro (born , died ) Bishop of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 2
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,412
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,749

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast