Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcony Vinícius Ferreira

Auxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Vertara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1964 Born
3 Dec 198824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
19 Feb 201449.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
19 Feb 201449.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vertara
12 Apr 201450.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vertara

MicroData Summary for Marcony Vinícius Ferreira
Bishop Marcony Vinícius Ferreira (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brasília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Planalto
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Cathedral, Brasilia, Archdiocese of Brasília, Distrito Federal

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Brasília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 26 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast