Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vila y Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1866Born
21 Sep 188922.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 192559.1AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
24 Feb 192659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
1 Sep 193265.8DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Vila y Martínez
Bishop José Vila y Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenavites
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,628

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast