Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Viladrich y Gaspar

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1865Born
22 Dec 188823.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 192156.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain
26 Jun 192156.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
25 Jul 192156.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
25 Sep 192661.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Viladrich y Gaspar
Bishop Jaime Viladrich y Gaspar (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClará

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast