Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio del Val Gallo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1916Born
23 Jul 194428.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 196952.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
4 Apr 196952.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Santa Giusta
15 May 196952.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Santa Giusta
3 Dec 197155.4AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
23 Aug 199175.1RetiredBishop of Santander, Spain
13 Nov 200286.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary
Juan Antonio del Val Gallo
Bishop Juan Antonio del Val Gallo
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarrio Panizares del Tozo
Ordained BishopJerez de la Frontera, Church, Cádiz, Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 151
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025