Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal de Solís Folch de Cardona

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1713Born
20 Jan 174935.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Jan 174935.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
16 Mar 174936.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
25 Sep 175239.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Córdoba, Spain
17 Nov 175542.7AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
5 Apr 175643.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 176956.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
21 Mar 177663.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Solís Folch de Cardona
Francisco Cardinal de Solís Folch de Cardona (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1756
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 66, Number 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 7
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 472
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 843, Ascendance
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast