Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romualdo Antonio Mon y Velarde

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1749Born
26 Sep 180354.5AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
8 Apr 180455.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
23 Sep 181667.5AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
16 Dec 181970.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Romualdo Antonio Mon y Velarde
Archbishop Romualdo Antonio Mon y Velarde (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOscos

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 6
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 217, and Page 359
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 125, Number 662
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 843, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast