Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aleksandar Tokic

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1911Born
27 Mar 193726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
3 Jan 195240.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
3 Jan 195240.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bizya
27 Apr 195241.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bizya
14 Nov 195544.7SucceededArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
6 May 197968.1DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Aleksandar Tokic
Archbishop Aleksandar Tokic (born , died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStari Bar, Archdiocese of Bar (Antivari)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb, Croatia

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1952, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,811
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast